U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80337-
  • Case Name: Douglas James Maynard and Sandra Susan Maynard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Advice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.