U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40355-
  • Case Name: Marcus Skopec and Bailey Skopec
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notification of Debtors Failure to Comply]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.