U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40356
  • Case Name: Victoria Lynn Keating
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Pay Advice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.