U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-51416-gwz
  • Case Name: JORGE ALFREDO HIDALGO-BARRON and CLEMENTINA HIDALGO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Trustee Voucher]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Final Decree and Closing of Chapter 7 Case (AutoClose)]
  • May 27, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Initial Asset Report]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 03, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
  • February 02, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Discharge of Debtor (ECF-BNC)]
January, 2016
  • January 30, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Notice of Assets & Notice to File Claims (ECF-BNC)]
  • January 04, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Financial Management Course (Official Form 423)]
December, 2015
  • December 19, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 17, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Notice of Requirement to File Certificate of Financial Management (BNC)]
  • December 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (BNC)]
  • December 08, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [122A-2 Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form]
  • December 08, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Notice of Docketing Error (BNC)]
  • December 07, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [122A-2 Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Notice of Filing of Chapter 13 Standing Trustee's Final Report and Account -Converted]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order: Directing the Filing of a Final Report and Schedules]
  • October 30, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset Individual (BNC)]
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7]
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LOVATO, CHRISTINA W. [Directing the Filing of a Final Report]
  • October 27, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • October 27, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Auto-docket of credit card]
  • October 26, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Schedules]
  • October 26, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Auto-docket of credit card]
  • October 18, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 18, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-13]
  • October 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 13 (BNC)]
  • October 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Hearing Sched/Resched (Confirmation Hearing-13)]
  • October 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • October 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Auto-docket of credit card]
  • October 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 13]
  • October 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • October 15, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.