open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00123-1
    Party Name:USA v. Friedlander
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136971
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =