U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00363-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Findings of Fact]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.