U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00495-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phillips
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Petition for Modification of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.