U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00511-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castelo-Meza et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [BICE Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.