U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00528-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Petition for Modification of Pretrial Release Conditions]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.