U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00554-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rhoads
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.