U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00557-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mir
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.