U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00584-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smietana
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Addendum to Petition]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Detention Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.