U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00771-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Addendum to Petition]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Victim Rights]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.