open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:19-17671-abl
    Party Name:NICHOLAS MARIO SCAGLIONE
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Final Decree and Closing of Chapter 7 Case (AutoClose)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Discharge of Debtor (BNC)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Notice of Requirement to File Certificate of Financial Management (BNC)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSEN, RYAN A. [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?387514
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =