U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tripp
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 03, 2020: [Detention Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.