U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00882-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clardy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.