U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00950-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 26, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.