U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00964-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tang
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.