U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lira-Cabrera
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [BICE Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.