U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Urrutia Jimenez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.