U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-00036-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Elms et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.