U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2020: [Detention Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum / ad Testificandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.