U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00446-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cooley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [XX - Order on Motion to Alter Judgment TURNED OFF]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Commitment to Another District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.