U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00684-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Madrid-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.