U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00482-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanns
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.