open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:20-13785-abl
    Party Name:MEG ANNE SHERWOOD
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ATKINSON, ROBERT E. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?392824
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =