open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:20-13893-nmc
    Party Name:MICHELE KAY MCCOY
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [In forma pauperis (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (In forma pauperis)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (In forma pauperis)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?392958
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =