U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00695-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zubias-Gamez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.