U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00709-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elkind
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 05, 2021: [Order]
  • June 05, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [XX - Order on Motion for Reconsideration TURNED OFF]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.