U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00801-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avalos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Detention Order]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.