U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00821-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.