U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00782-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Cortez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • September 30, 2020: [BICE Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.