open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:20-50971-btb
    Party Name:DARRIN L. CHEW and KELLY M. CHEW
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Notice of Appearance (BK)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Hearing Sched/Resched (Confirmation Hearing-13)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (Pre-confirmation)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-13]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 13 (BNC)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Chapter 13 Plan #1]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: VAN, METER WILLIAM A. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?394569
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =