U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00892-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Greenland et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Petition for Modification of Pretrial Release Conditions]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.