U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00902-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.