U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00948-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno-Gallardo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [BICE Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.