U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00969-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wade
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Detention Order]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum / ad Testificandum]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.