U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-01031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salguero-Salguero
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.