U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Christy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.