U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.