U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [BICE Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.