U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.