U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00730-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Magana-Rojas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [BICE Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.