U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ellis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.