U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rios
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.