U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00461-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Padilla
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention Order]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2021: [BICE Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.