U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00887-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shedleski
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.