U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00926-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortega-Lazo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.