U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00907-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esguerra
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.