U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Housley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Vacate - 2255]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.